+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (38)
On May 8, 2007 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 185
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Final disposition: None
On May 3, 2007 in the House:
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 23, 2007 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On April 16, 2007 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 11, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Blendu flr amend (ref Bill)
On April 4, 2007 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 11:55 amobject
On March 13, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transportation: Do pass
On February 28, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 26, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: CMMA - passed as amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to CMMA - McClure
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 13, 2007 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On January 25, 2007 in the House:
- Transportation: Do pass
On January 22, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On January 18, 2007 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- Assigned to committee: Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (12)
Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Blendu Floor Amendment, reference to House engrossed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
McClure Floor Amendment, reference to the COUNTIES, MUNICIPALITIES AND MILITARY AFFAIRS Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Blendu Floor Amendment, reference to House engrossed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
McClure Floor Amendment, reference to the COUNTIES, MUNICIPALITIES AND MILITARY AFFAIRS Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
4-30trans_aspassedbysenate
Senate Fact Sheet
Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
3-9 trans
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (7)
May 3, 2007: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 4
April 16, 2007: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
February 27, 2007: Transportation: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
February 26, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
January 18, 2007: Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 2
January 18, 2007: Transportation: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 10
January 18, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor