+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:15PM.
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Government Committee: withdrawn.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 5:45PM.
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- House Federalism, Property Rights and Public Policy Committee: do pass.
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Federalism, Property Rights and Public Policy Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (5)
March 27, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 12
February 27, 2017: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 4
February 9, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 25
January 17, 2017: House Federalism, Property Rights and Public Policy Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
January 17, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (34)
Type:
Primary Sponsor