+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 28, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On March 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Judiciary Committee: do pass.
On March 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
On March 2, 2023 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 1, 2023 in the House:
- Amended by JUD - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 21, 2023 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 8, 2023 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On February 1, 2023 in the House:
- House Judiciary Committee: do pass amended.
On January 19, 2023 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 18, 2023 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Judiciary Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
March 13, 2023: Senate Appropriations1 Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
March 13, 2023: Senate Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
March 13, 2023: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
March 1, 2023: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 28
January 18, 2023: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
January 18, 2023: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
January 18, 2023: House Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor