+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:18PM.
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Government Committee: do pass.
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- JUD - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- House Judiciary Committee: do pass amended.
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 19, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Judiciary Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (10)
March 24, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 10
March 24, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 1
February 23, 2016: Government: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
February 23, 2016: Senate Government Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
February 18, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 2
February 18, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 23
January 19, 2016: Judiciary: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
January 19, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
January 19, 2016: House Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
January 19, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor