+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 1:15 pmobject
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Government and Environment: Do pass
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Government and Environment
- Senate first read
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 2:27 pm
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Agriculture and Water: Do pass
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Agriculture and Water
- House first read
+ − Amendments (2)
2-24 ge_revised
Senate Fact Sheet
2-20 ge
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (4)
February 18, 2014: Government and Environment: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
February 10, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 60
January 22, 2014: Agriculture and Water: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
January 22, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor