+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Failed
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Government Committee: do pass.
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
- First read in Senate.
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- JUD - passed
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- House Judiciary Committee: do pass amended.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Judiciary Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (10)
May 5, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 18
May 5, 2016: Third read: failed (Senate)
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 1
March 1, 2016: Senate Government Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
March 1, 2016: Government: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
February 25, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 29
February 25, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 29
January 21, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2
January 21, 2016: Judiciary: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
January 21, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
January 21, 2016: House Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1