+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Government: Held
On February 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Rules
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On February 13, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On February 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 12, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On January 30, 2007 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Consent calendar: 10:30 am
On January 23, 2007 in the House:
- Government: Do pass
On January 17, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On January 16, 2007 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendment
3-14 gov
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (3)
February 12, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 2
January 16, 2007: Government: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 10
January 16, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor