+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Failed
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- House Judiciary Committee: do pass.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Judiciary Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Votes (6)
February 24, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 30
February 24, 2016: Third read: failed (House)
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 30
- Present/NV: 1
January 21, 2016: House Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
January 21, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
January 21, 2016: Judiciary: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
January 21, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor