+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 25, 2011 in the House:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Chapter: 215
- Action: Signed
On April 20, 2011 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 19, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Amendment failed: Gallardo flr amend (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 1:10 pmobject
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Education: Do pass
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 1, 2011 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 28, 2011 in the House:
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to ED - Fillmore
- Amendment passed: ED
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 21, 2011 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 14, 2011 in the House:
- Education: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On January 20, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On January 19, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Education
- House first read
+ − Amendments (7)
Education - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Education - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Fillmore Floor Amendment; reference to the Education Committee Amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Education - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Education - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
3-3 ed
Senate Fact Sheet
Fillmore Floor Amendment; reference to the Education Committee Amendment
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
April 19, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 5
March 2, 2011: Education: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
March 1, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 3
January 19, 2011: Education: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 2
January 19, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor