+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Final reading in House: Passed
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- House concurred.
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Conference committee recommended.
- House Minority Caucus.
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- GOV (ref Bill) adopted
- Kavanagh flr amend (ref GOV) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Government Committee: do pass amended.
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 4:58PM.
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee: do pass.
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
April 17, 2017: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 24
April 4, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 12
February 20, 2017: Senate Government Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
February 6, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 25
January 17, 2017: House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
January 17, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor