+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Finance Committee: do pass.
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Finance Committee.
- First read in Senate.
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- WM - passed
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Committee of the Whole consent calendar at 10:44AM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- House Ways and Means Committee: do pass amended.
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Ways and Means Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
May 4, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
February 20, 2017: Senate Finance Committee
- Yeas: 6
February 13, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 1
January 17, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
January 17, 2017: House Ways and Means Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor