+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Commerce, Energy and Military: Discussion only
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
- Rules
- Assigned to committee: Commerce, Energy and Military
- Senate first read
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: HEWD
- Third read: Passed
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Higher Education and Workforce Development: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- House second read
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Higher Education and Workforce Development
- House first read
+ − Amendments (7)
Commerce, Energy and Military - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Higher Education and Workforce Development - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Higher Education and Workforce Development - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Commerce, Energy and Military - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Higher Education and Workforce Development - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Higher Education and Workforce Development - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
3-18 cem_strikermemo
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (3)
February 28, 2013: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 56
- Present/NV: 4
January 22, 2013: Higher Education and Workforce Development: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 8
January 22, 2013: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor