+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 192
- Action: Signed
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- House final read: Passed
- House concurrence
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: Yee flr amend (ref CWD)
- Amendment adopted: RULES (ref CWD)
- Amendment adopted: CWD (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Commerce amd Workforce Development: Do pass amended
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Commerce amd Workforce Development
- Senate first read
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Amendment passed: COM
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Third read: Passed
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass amended
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- House first read
+ − Amendments (7)
Commerce and Workforce Development
Senate Proposed Amendment
Commerce and Workforce Development
Senate Proposed Amendment
Commerce
House Proposed Amendment
Yee flr amend (ref CWD) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce and Workforce Development
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
March 30, 2015: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 20
March 24, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 2
February 17, 2015: Commerce amd Workforce Development: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
February 4, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 21
- Present/NV: 2
January 22, 2015: Commerce: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
January 22, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (34)
Type:
Primary Sponsor