+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 23, 2010 in the Senate:
- Commerce and Economic Development: Do pass amended
On March 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce and Economic Development
- Rules
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On March 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On March 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 3, 2010 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 2, 2010 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: COM
- Amendment passed: Sub Floor Amend to COM - Reagan
- Amendment passed: RULES
On March 1, 2010 in the House:
- Rules: Amended constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On January 27, 2010 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass amended
On January 21, 2010 in the House:
- House second read
On January 20, 2010 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (10)
Commerce and Economic Development
Senate Adopted Amendment
Reagan Substitute Floor amendment to the Commerce Committee amendment; reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Rules
House Adopted Amendment
Commerce
House Adopted Amendment
Commerce and Economic Development
Senate Proposed Amendment
Commerce and Economic Development
Senate Adopted Amendment
Reagan Substitute Floor amendment to the Commerce Committee amendment; reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Rules
House Adopted Amendment
Commerce and Economic Development
Senate Proposed Amendment
Commerce
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 8, 2010: Commerce and Economic Development: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
March 3, 2010: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 5
January 20, 2010: Commerce: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 3
January 20, 2010: Rules: Amended constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor