+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Education Committee: do pass amended.
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Education Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Amended by ED - withdrawn
- Amended by APPROP - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: Passed
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- House Education Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Education Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (5)
March 2, 2017: Senate Education Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
March 1, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 2
February 16, 2017: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 12
January 17, 2017: House Education Committee
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 1
January 17, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor