+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 16, 2007 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 71
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Final disposition: None
On April 11, 2007 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 10, 2007 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 11:55 am
On March 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Government: Do pass
On February 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On February 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 19, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: GOV - passed as amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to GOV - Adams
On February 13, 2007 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Minority caucus: Yes
On January 23, 2007 in the House:
- Government: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On January 17, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On January 16, 2007 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (8)
Government - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Government - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Adams Floor Amendment, Reference to the Government Committee Amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Government - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
3-9 gov corrected
Senate Fact Sheet
Adams Floor Amendment, Reference to the Government Committee Amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Government - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
3-7 gov
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 10, 2007: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
February 21, 2007: Government: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
February 19, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 55
- Present/NV: 5
January 16, 2007: Government: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 10
January 16, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor