+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:25 pm
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 2:14 pm
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Financial Institutions: Do pass
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Commerce: Withdrawn
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- House second read
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- Assigned to committee: Financial Institutions
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendment
3-4 fin
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (4)
February 27, 2013: Finance: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
February 25, 2013: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 1
January 22, 2013: Financial Institutions: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
January 22, 2013: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor