+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 15, 2008 in the House:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Chapter: 36
- Action: Signed
On April 9, 2008 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 8, 2008 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 25, 2008 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 24, 2008 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 11:54 amobject
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Commerce and Economic Development: Do pass
On February 26, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Commerce and Economic Development
- Senate second read
On February 19, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On February 18, 2008 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 18, 2008 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 14, 2008 in the House:
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Hershberger
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 12, 2008 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 10:30 amobject
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On January 30, 2008 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass
On January 17, 2008 in the House:
- House second read
- Human Services: Do pass
On January 16, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- Assigned to committee: Human Services
- House first read
+ − Amendments (3)
Hershberger Floor Amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
3-10 ced
Senate Fact Sheet
Hershberger Floor Amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
April 8, 2008: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
February 26, 2008: Commerce and Economic Development: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1
February 18, 2008: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 54
- Present/NV: 6
January 16, 2008: Commerce: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 2
January 16, 2008: Human Services: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 10
January 16, 2008: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor