+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Education: Do pass
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
- Rules
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Senate first read
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: GHE
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Government and Higher Education: Do pass amended
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Government and Higher Education
- House first read
+ − Amendments (2)
Government and Higher Education
House Proposed Amendment
Government and Higher Education
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 23, 2015: Education: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
February 19, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
January 22, 2015: Government and Higher Education: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
January 22, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor