+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 51
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: RULES (ref Bill)
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended with recommendation for a floor amendment
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Natural Resources and Rural Affairs: Do pass
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Natural Resources and Rural Affairs
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: COM
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass amended
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (7)
+ − Votes (6)
April 15, 2014: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 60
April 8, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 3
February 18, 2014: Natural Resources and Rural Affairs: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
February 10, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 60
January 22, 2014: Commerce: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
January 22, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor