+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 54 e
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Amendment withdrawn: PS (ref Bill)
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Safety: Do pass amended
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: PSMRA
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to PSMRA - Kavanagh
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs: Do pass amended
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- House second read
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (10)
Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs
House Proposed Amendment
Public Safety
Senate Adopted Amendment
Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs
House Adopted Amendment
Kavanagh Floor Amendment; Reference to the PUBLIC SAFETY, MILITARY AFFAIRS AND REGULATORY AFFAIRS Committee Amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Public Safety
Senate Proposed Amendment
Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs
House Proposed Amendment
Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs
House Adopted Amendment
Public Safety
Senate Adopted Amendment
Kavanagh Floor Amendment; Reference to the PUBLIC SAFETY, MILITARY AFFAIRS AND REGULATORY AFFAIRS Committee Amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Public Safety
Senate Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
April 1, 2013: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 25
- Present/NV: 5
February 19, 2013: Public Safety: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
February 12, 2013: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
January 22, 2013: Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 8
January 22, 2013: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (35)
Type:
Primary Sponsor