+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Chapter: 91
- Action: Signed
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 1:06 pm
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Education: Do pass
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 2:37 pm
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Education: Do pass
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- House second read
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Education
- House first read
+ − Votes (5)
April 9, 2013: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 5
February 19, 2013: Education: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
February 13, 2013: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 1
January 22, 2013: Education: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
January 22, 2013: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1