+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- First read in Senate.
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- Objection to the consent calendar.
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 4:43PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- House Government and Higher Education Committee: do pass.
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 19, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Government and Higher Education Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Votes (6)
February 17, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 24
February 17, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 24
January 19, 2016: Government and Higher Education: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
January 19, 2016: House Government and Higher Education Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
January 19, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
January 19, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor