+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Failed
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senator Allen moved that the Senate reconsider its action whereby it failed to pass HB 2201 on Third Reading on April 5, 2016. Motion carried.
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Failed
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- FMFR (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Federalism, Mandates and Fiscal Responsibility Committee: do pass amended.
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Federalism, Mandates and Fiscal Responsibility Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 3:58PM.
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- House Federalism and States' Rights Committee: do pass.
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 19, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Federalism and States' Rights Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (3)
Federalism, Mandates and Fiscal Responsibility
Senate Proposed Amendment
Federalism, Mandates and Fiscal Responsibility
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (10)
April 13, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 15
April 5, 2016: Third read: failed (Senate)
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 1
February 23, 2016: Senate Federalism, Mandates and Fiscal Responsibility Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
February 23, 2016: Federalism, Mandates and Fiscal Responsibility: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
February 18, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 27
- Present/NV: 2
February 18, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 27
January 19, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
January 19, 2016: House Federalism and States' Rights Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
January 19, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 6
January 19, 2016: Federalism and States' Rights: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor