+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- First read in Senate.
On February 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- Placed on the consent calendar at 9:00AM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On January 19, 2022 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 18, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 1, 2022: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 10
February 24, 2022: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 9
January 18, 2022: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 1
January 18, 2022: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor