+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 14, 2022 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- House Commerce Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On February 14, 2022 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Commerce Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
February 10, 2022: House Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
February 10, 2022: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor