+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- APPROP - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass amended.
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- House Education Committee: do pass.
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Education Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
February 27, 2017: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
February 21, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 11
January 17, 2017: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 12
January 17, 2017: House Education Committee
- Yeas: 10
January 17, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor