+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 3:00PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- House Transportation Committee: do pass.
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Transportation Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Votes (3)
January 28, 2020: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 11
January 28, 2020: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
January 28, 2020: House Transportation Committee
- Yeas: 8