+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: ED (ref Bill)
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Education: Do pass amended
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 1:59 pm
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Government: Do pass
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Education: Do pass
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- House second read
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (4)
Education
Senate Adopted Amendment
Education
Senate Adopted Amendment
3-12 ed
Senate Fact Sheet
3-18 ed_caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
February 27, 2013: Education: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
February 25, 2013: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 60
January 23, 2013: Education: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 9
January 23, 2013: Government: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
January 23, 2013: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor