+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (38)
On July 7, 2008 in the House:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 300 e
- Action: Signed
On June 26, 2008 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- House final read: Passed
- House concurrence
On June 25, 2008 in the House:
- Concurrence recommended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On June 23, 2008 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On June 23, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On June 17, 2008 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: Gray C flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: RULES (ref APPROP)
- Amendment adopted: APPROP (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On June 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On May 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
On May 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
On April 22, 2008 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass amended
On April 10, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Judiciary: Withdrawn
On March 20, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 19, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Senate first read
On March 18, 2008 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 18, 2008 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 13, 2008 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: CMMA - passed as amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to CMMA - Nelson
On March 11, 2008 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 4, 2008 in the House:
- Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs: Do pass amended/strike-everything
- Assigned to committee: Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs
On January 16, 2008 in the House:
- House second read
On January 15, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- House first read
+ − Amendments (15)
Gray C Floor Amendment; reference to House engrossed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Adopted Amendment
Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Nelson Floor amendment, reference to the Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Adopted Amendment
Gray C Floor Amendment; reference to House engrossed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
June 26, 2008: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 60
June 23, 2008: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 24
- Present/NV: 6
April 10, 2008: Appropriations: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
March 18, 2008: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
March 4, 2008: Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 3
January 15, 2008: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor