+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Health and Human Services Committee.
- Referred to Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 5:45PM.
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- House Health Committee: do pass.
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Health Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (3)
February 9, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 19
January 18, 2017: House Health Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
January 18, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor