+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 12, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 6, 2016 in the House:
- Final reading in House: Passed
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- House concurred.
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Conference committee recommended.
- House Minority Caucus.
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Yee flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Commerce and Workforce Development Committee: do pass.
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Commerce and Workforce Development Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- COM - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- House Commerce Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 19, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Commerce Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (5)
Commerce - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Yee flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (12)
May 6, 2016: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 21
- Present/NV: 4
May 6, 2016: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 21
March 29, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 2
March 29, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 8
March 1, 2016: Commerce and Workforce Development: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
March 1, 2016: Senate Commerce and Workforce Development Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
February 24, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 23
February 24, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 2
January 19, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
January 19, 2016: Commerce: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
January 19, 2016: House Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
January 19, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor