+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 22, 2017 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- House concurred.
- Final reading in House: Passed
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Conference committee recommended.
- House Minority Caucus.
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- FIN (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Finance Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Finance Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- HEALTH - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- House Health Committee: do pass amended.
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Health Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
May 10, 2017: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 20
May 8, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 7
February 27, 2017: Senate Finance Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
February 21, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 58
January 17, 2017: House Health Committee
- Yeas: 9
January 17, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor