+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senator Borrelli motion to reconsider whereby the Senate failed to pass HB 2190 on Third Reading on May 20, 2021. Motion carried.
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- APPROP (ref Bill) adopted
- Pace #2 flr amend (ref APPROP) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in Senate: FAILED
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Judiciary Committee: withdrawn.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Amended by CJR - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on Committee of the Whole consent calendar at 9:55AM.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- House Criminal Justice Reform Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Criminal Justice Reform Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (5)
May 20, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 16
March 2, 2021: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 4
February 24, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 59
January 25, 2021: House Criminal Justice Reform Committee
- Yeas: 9
January 25, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8