+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senator Shope motion to reconsider whereby the Senate failed to pass HB 2188 on Third Reading on March 16, 2021. Motion carried.
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: FAILED
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:08PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee: do pass.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee.
- First read in Senate.
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 2:45PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee: do pass.
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Votes (5)
March 16, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 22
February 18, 2021: Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
February 4, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 15
January 20, 2021: House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee
- Yeas: 11
January 20, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor