+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Commerce Committee: do pass.
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Commerce Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 4:39PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- House Regulatory Affairs Committee: do pass.
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Regulatory Affairs Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Votes (5)
April 9, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 28
February 25, 2019: Senate Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 6
February 11, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 60
January 23, 2019: House Regulatory Affairs Committee
- Yeas: 7
January 23, 2019: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor