+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:08PM.
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Transportation and Technology Committee: do pass.
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Transportation and Technology Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Amended by JUD - passed
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on Committee of the Whole consent calendar at 1:55PM.
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- House Judiciary Committee: do pass amended.
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Judiciary Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
March 29, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
February 23, 2021: Senate Transportation and Technology Committee
- Yeas: 9
February 18, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 60
January 25, 2021: House Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 10
January 25, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor