+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- First read in Senate.
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- SUB Floor Amend to APPROP - Friese - failed
- APPROP - passed
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass amended.
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- House Education Committee: do pass.
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Education Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 11, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 27
January 22, 2019: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 1
January 22, 2019: House Education Committee
- Yeas: 13
January 22, 2019: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor