+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Chapter: 226
- Action: Signed
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Education: Do pass
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Senate first read
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Amendment passed: APPROP
- Amendment withdrawn: ED
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Appropriations: Do pass amended
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
- Education: Do pass amended
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Education
- House first read
+ − Amendments (3)
Appropriations
House Proposed Amendment
Education
House Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
March 31, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
February 17, 2015: Education: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
February 16, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 1
January 20, 2015: Appropriations: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 3
January 20, 2015: Education: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
January 20, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor