+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:55 pmobject
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Commerce, Energy and Military: Do pass
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce, Energy and Military
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: COM
- Amendment passed: Sub Floor Amend to COM - Fann
- Third read: Passed
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass amended
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- House second read
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (8)
Commerce
House Proposed Amendment
Fann SUBSTITUTE Floor Amendment to the COMMERCE Committee Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Commerce
House Adopted Amendment
Commerce
House Proposed Amendment
Commerce, Energy and Military
Senate Proposed Amendment
Commerce
House Adopted Amendment
Fann SUBSTITUTE Floor Amendment to the COMMERCE Committee Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Commerce, Energy and Military
Senate Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 18, 2013: Commerce, Energy and Military: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
March 13, 2013: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Present/NV: 3
January 22, 2013: Commerce: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
January 22, 2013: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor