+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 16, 2007 in the House:
- Final disposition: None
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Chapter: 68
- Action: Signed
On April 11, 2007 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 10, 2007 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 11:55 am
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Education K-12: Do pass
On February 28, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Education K-12
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 26, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Schapira
- Amendment passed: RULES
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 8, 2007 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Amended constitutional and in proper form
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- Education (K-12): Do pass
On January 24, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On January 23, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Education (K-12)
- House first read
+ − Amendments (7)
Schapira Floor Amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Education K-12
Senate Proposed Amendment
Rules
House Adopted Amendment
Education K-12
Senate Proposed Amendment
Rules
House Adopted Amendment
Schapira Floor Amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
3-12 k12
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 10, 2007: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
February 27, 2007: Education K-12: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
February 26, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
January 23, 2007: Education (K-12): Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
January 23, 2007: Rules: Amended constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor