+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (41)
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 259
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Vote detail 21 7 2 0 y passed
- Motion to reconsider: Date ayes nays nv exc vac
- 0 0 0 0
- Motion
- Senator yee moved to reconsider whereby the Senate failed to pass hb 2179 on third reading on april 21, 2014. the motion carried.
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third read: Failed
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: PS (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: RULES (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Crandell flr amend (ref Bill)
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Safety: Do pass amended
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: GOV
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to GOV - Coleman
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Government: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (17)
Government - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Public Safety
Senate Adopted Amendment
Crandell flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Coleman Floor Amendment; Reference to GOVERNMENT Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Government - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Public Safety
Senate Proposed Amendment
Public Safety
Senate Proposed Amendment
Public Safety
Senate Proposed Amendment
Government - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Public Safety
Senate Adopted Amendment
Crandell flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Government - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Public Safety
Senate Proposed Amendment
Coleman Floor Amendment; Reference to GOVERNMENT Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Public Safety
Senate Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
April 23, 2014: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 7
April 21, 2014: Third read: failed (Senate)
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 7
March 13, 2014: Public Safety: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
March 5, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 2
January 22, 2014: Government: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
January 22, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor