+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- HEALTH - passed
- Floor Amend to Bill - Gabaldón - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- House Health Committee: do pass amended.
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee: do pass.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Health Committee.
+ − Amendments (5)
Health
House Proposed Amendment
Health
House Adopted Amendment
Floor Amend to Bill - Gabaldón - passed
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
February 18, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 3
February 18, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 3
January 21, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 6
January 21, 2016: House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
- Yeas: 9
January 21, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
January 21, 2016: Health: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 6
January 21, 2016: Transportation and Infrastructure: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 9
January 21, 2016: House Health Committee
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor