+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 16, 2018 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:12PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee: do pass.
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 6:05PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- House Government Committee: do pass.
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Government Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Votes (5)
March 13, 2018: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
February 15, 2018: Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 8, 2018: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 57
January 17, 2018: House Government Committee
- Yeas: 8
January 17, 2018: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor