+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- APPROP - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass amended.
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- House Government and Higher Education Committee: do pass.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Government and Higher Education Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
+ − Amendments (3)
Appropriations
House Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
March 3, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 18
March 3, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 3
January 21, 2016: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 1
January 21, 2016: House Government and Higher Education Committee
- Yeas: 6
January 21, 2016: Appropriations: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
January 21, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
January 21, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
January 21, 2016: Government and Higher Education: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor