+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 187
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: McComish flr amend (ref Bill)
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:25 pmobject
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Commerce, Energy and Military: Do pass
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce, Energy and Military
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: COM
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Fann
- Third read: Passed
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass amended
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- House second read
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (11)
Commerce, Energy and Military
Senate Proposed Amendment
McComish flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce
House Proposed Amendment
Fann Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Commerce
House Adopted Amendment
Commerce, Energy and Military
Senate Proposed Amendment
Commerce
House Proposed Amendment
Fann Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
McComish flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce
House Adopted Amendment
3-11 cem
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
May 2, 2013: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
April 25, 2013: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
March 4, 2013: Commerce, Energy and Military: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
February 28, 2013: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Present/NV: 3
January 22, 2013: Commerce: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
January 22, 2013: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor