+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Action: Vetoed
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Allen flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment failed: Ableser flr amend (ref Bill) (sub Allen flr amend)
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rural Affairs and Environment: Do pass
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Rural Affairs and Environment
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: APPROP - passed as amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to APPROP - Thorpe
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Federalism and States' Rights: Withdrawn
- Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Federalism and States' Rights
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (6)
Rural Affairs and Environment
Senate Proposed Amendment
Ableser flr amend (ref Bill) (sub Allen flr amend) failed
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Allen flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Floor Amend to APPROP - Thorpe - passed
House Adopted Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
April 1, 2015: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 2
March 31, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 1
March 11, 2015: Rural Affairs and Environment: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
March 10, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 24
January 22, 2015: Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 5
January 22, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 1