+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 277 w/o
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Federalism, Mandates and Fiscal Responsibility: Do pass
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Federalism, Mandates and Fiscal Responsibility
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: FSR
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Federalism and States' Rights: Do pass amended
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Federalism and States' Rights
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (2)
Federalism and States' Rights
House Proposed Amendment
Federalism and States' Rights
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 31, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 1
March 10, 2015: Federalism, Mandates and Fiscal Responsibility: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 3
March 9, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 1
January 22, 2015: Federalism and States' Rights: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
January 22, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2