+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Final disposition: Failed in House on third reading
- Final disposition: Failed in House on third reading
- Third read: Failed
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to ED - Finchem
- Amendment: ED - passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
- Education: Do pass amended
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Education
- House first read
+ − Amendments (2)
Floor Amend to ED - Finchem - passed
House Adopted Amendment
Education
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 10, 2015: Third read: failed (House)
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 32
January 20, 2015: Education: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
January 20, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor