+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Action: Vetoed
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 11:45 am
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Financial Institutions: Do pass
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Financial Institutions
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: FSR
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Federalism and States' Rights: Do pass amended
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Federalism and States' Rights
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (2)
Federalism and States' Rights
House Proposed Amendment
Federalism and States' Rights
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 25, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 1
February 19, 2015: Financial Institutions: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
February 18, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 3
January 20, 2015: Federalism and States' Rights: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
January 20, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9